dc.date.accessioned | 2011-01-31T15:50:19Z | |
dc.date.accessioned | 2019-09-01T15:01:34Z | |
dc.date.available | 2011-01-31T15:50:19Z | |
dc.date.available | 2019-09-01T15:01:34Z | |
dc.date.issued | 2005-01-14 | en_US |
dc.identifier.uri | http://hdl.handle.net/1989/6809 | |
dc.description | 2 p. | en_US |
dc.description.abstract | Bege K. Bowers is named interim provost upon the resignation of Tony Atwater on February 1, 2005. | en_US |
dc.language.iso | en_US | en_US |
dc.subject | Bowers, Bege K. | en_US |
dc.subject | Provosts | en_US |
dc.subject.other | Administration | en_US |
dc.title | Bege Bowers named interim provost at YSU | en_US |
dc.type | Article | en_US |